Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Catalino Claudio Giménez Medina, P. Schönstatt

Bishop of Caacupé, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1940 Born
15 Oct 197231.8Ordained PriestPriest of Institute of Schönstatt Fathers
8 Nov 199150.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Asunción, Paraguay
8 Nov 199150.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Horaea
22 Dec 199151.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horaea
3 Jun 199554.5AppointedBishop of Caacupé, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Catalino Claudio Giménez Medina
Bishop Catalino Claudio Giménez Medina P. Schönstatt (born ) Bishop of Caacupé

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuerto Pinasco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caacupé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,650

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017