Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustín Van Aaken, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Alto Paraná, Paraguay

Titular Bishop of Achyraus


Motto: Servir en Caridad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1914Born
1937²22.4First VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
1940²25.4Final VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
28 Apr 194126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
25 Jul 197258.0AppointedPrelate of Alto Paraná, Paraguay
25 Jul 197258.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Achyraus
12 Aug 197258.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achyraus
19 Apr 199075.7RetiredPrelate of Alto Paraná, Paraguay
11 Aug 199076.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Alto Paraná, Paraguay

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Augustín Van Aaken
Bishop Augustín Van Aaken S.V.D.
(born , died )
Prelate Emeritus of Alto Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKevalaer
Ordained PriestSt. Augustin, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
Ordained BishopChurch, Encarnacion
Death PlaceObligado
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Ciudad del Este, Territorial Prelature of Alto Paraná

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,093
  • firs/fina: Index Defunctorum Societatis Verbi Divini 1875-2010, Page 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 25 May 2025