Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebelio Peralta Alvarez

Deceased

Bishop of San Lorenzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1939BornBorja
19 Dec 196425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Villarrica, Paraguay
5 Mar 197939.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Villarrica, Paraguay
5 Mar 197939.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Iunca in Mauretania
1 May 197939.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iunca in Mauretania
19 Apr 199050.5AppointedBishop of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo, Paraguay
27 Dec 200869.2AppointedBishop of San Lorenzo, Paraguay
19 Nov 201475.1DiedBishop of San Lorenzo, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Sebelio Peralta Alvarez:
Bishop Sebelio Peralta Alvarez (born , died ) Bishop of San Lorenzo

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2008
  • d: CB, 19 Nov 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015