Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Benigno Laschi González

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Asunción

Titular Bishop of Abydus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1914BornConcepción
17 Jan 193722.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 195541.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Concepción y Chaco, Paraguay
23 Mar 195541.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
29 Jun 195541.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
2 Feb 196551.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Asunción, Paraguay
19 May 196955.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Asunción, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Julio Benigno Laschi González:
Bishop Julio Benigno Laschi González (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Asunción

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013