Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Moleón Andreu

Deceased

Bishop of Paraguay, Military

Titular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1906BornAsunción
30 Nov 194135.4Ordained PriestPriest of Asunción, Paraguay
17 Jul 196761.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Asunción, Paraguay
17 Jul 196761.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
13 Aug 196761.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
1 Feb 197265.6AppointedBishop of Paraguay, Military
20 Sep 198074.2DiedBishop of Paraguay, Military

MicroData Summary for Juan Moleón Andreu:
Bishop Juan Moleón Andreu (born , died ) Bishop of Paraguay, Military

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015