Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonsus Augustus Sowada, O.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Agats, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1933Born
31 May 195824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Order of the Holy Cross
29 May 196935.9AppointedBishop of Agats, Indonesia
23 Nov 196936.4Ordained BishopBishop of Agats, Indonesia
9 May 200167.8ResignedBishop of Agats, Indonesia
11 Jan 201480.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Agats, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Alphonsus Augustus Sowada
Bishop Alphonsus Augustus Sowada O.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Agats

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvon, USA

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Jan 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018