Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Murwito, O.F.M.

Bishop of Agats, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1950 Born
7 Jul 198231.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Jun 200251.4AppointedBishop of Agats, Indonesia
15 Sep 200251.7Ordained BishopBishop of Agats, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Murwito
Bishop Aloysius Murwito O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Agats

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSleman-Yogya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Agats.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018