Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Menéndez Fernández

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1957Born
10 May 198124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oviedo, Spain
26 Apr 201356.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oviedo, Spain
26 Apr 201356.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
8 Jun 201356.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasai
18 Nov 201558.8AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
15 May 201962.3DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Menéndez Fernández
Bishop Juan Antonio Menéndez Fernández (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillamarín de Salcedo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oviedo, Archdiocese of Oviedo
Death PlaceAstorga, Diocese of Astorga

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,800
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2015
  • d: CB, 15 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 17 May 2019

Quantcast