Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard James Umbers

Auxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia

Titular Bishop of Thala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1971 Born
1 Sep 200231.4Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
24 Jun 201645.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
24 Jun 201645.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thala
24 Aug 201645.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thala

MicroData Summary for Richard James Umbers
Bishop Richard James Umbers (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sydney

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOtahuhu, New Zealand
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Sydney.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Jun 2016
  • c34: CB, 24 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,083

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018