Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Lee Bun Sang

Bishop of Macau, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1956 Born
20 Aug 198831.7Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
11 Jul 201457.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
11 Jul 201457.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Novae
30 Aug 201457.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novae
16 Jan 201659.1AppointedBishop of Macau, China
23 Jan 201659.2InstalledBishop of Macau, China

MicroData Summary for Stephen Lee Bun Sang (VIAF: 60738401)
Bishop Stephen Lee Bun Sang (born ) Bishop of Macau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Hong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Macau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 Jul 2014
  • c34: CB, 30 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,281
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2016
  • i: CB, 16 Jan 2016
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast