Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Cardinal Zen Ze-kiun, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Madre del Redentore a Tor Bella Monaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1932 Born
16 Aug 194917.5First VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Aug 195523.5Solemn VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Feb 196129.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Sep 199664.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
9 Dec 199664.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
23 Sep 200270.6SucceededBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
20 Oct 200270.7InstalledBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
24 Mar 200674.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200674.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Madre del Redentore a Tor Bella Monaca
31 May 200674.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Madre del Redentore a Tor Bella Monaca
15 Apr 200977.2RetiredBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zen Ze-kiun (VIAF: 49539147)
Joseph Cardinal Zen Ze-kiun S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanghai, Vicariate Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing]
Ordained PriestTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Ordained BishopImmaculée Conception, Cathedral, Hong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,869
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • firs/sole/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Aug 2018

Quantcast