Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Yeung Ming-cheung

Deceased

Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1946Born
10 Jun 197831.5Ordained PriestPriest of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
11 Jul 201467.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
11 Jul 201467.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mons in Numidia
30 Aug 201467.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mons in Numidia
13 Nov 201669.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
1 Aug 201770.6SucceededBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
5 Aug 201770.6InstalledBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
3 Jan 201972.0DiedBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

MicroData Summary for Michael Yeung Ming-cheung
Bishop Michael Yeung Ming-cheung (born , died ) Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanghai
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Hong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]
Death PlaceCanossa, Hospital, Hong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 Jul 2014
  • c34: CB, 30 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,280
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2016
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2017
  • d: CB, 3 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 4 Jan 2019

Quantcast