Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mark Benedict Coleridge

Archbishop of Brisbane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1948 BornMelbourne
18 May 197425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
3 May 200253.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
3 May 200253.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
19 Jun 200253.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
19 Jun 200657.7AppointedArchbishop of Canberra-Goulburn, Australia
17 Aug 200657.9InstalledArchbishop of Canberra-Goulburn, Australia
2 Apr 201263.5AppointedArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia
11 May 201263.6InstalledArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for Mark Benedict Coleridge:
Archbishop Mark Benedict Coleridge (born ) Archbishop of Brisbane

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Brisbane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2012
  • i: CB, 2 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 8 Nov 2014