Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Anthony Kelly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne, Australia

Titular Bishop of Zucchabar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1915Born
28 Jul 194024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
16 Nov 197257.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
16 Nov 197257.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zucchabar
21 Feb 197357.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zucchabar
19 Aug 198670.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
24 Jul 198771.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Anthony Kelly
Bishop John Anthony Kelly (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouth Yarra

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast