Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Michael McGuckin

Bishop of Toowoomba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1944 BornMarrickville
20 Oct 197329.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
1993¹48.9IncardinatedPriest of Parramatta, Australia
14 May 201268.3AppointedBishop of Toowoomba, Australia
11 Jul 201268.5Ordained BishopBishop of Toowoomba, Australia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Michael McGuckin:
Bishop Robert Michael McGuckin (born ) Bishop of Toowoomba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Toowoomba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2012
  • ob/c1: CB, 14 May 2012
  • c2+: CB, 16 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,501

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013