Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Dumbrigue Aclan

Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Rusicade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1951 Born
5 Jun 199342.3Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
5 Mar 201968.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
5 Mar 201968.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusicade
16 May 201968.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusicade

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Dumbrigue Aclan
Bishop Alejandro Dumbrigue Aclan (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlacePasay City, Archdiocese of Manila, Philippines
Ordained PriestSt. Vibiana, Cathedral, Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Angels, Cathedral, Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2019
  • mn/ob/c12: CB, 5 Mar 2019
  • c34: CB, 5 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 18 May 2019

Quantcast