Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc Vincent Trudeau

Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Tinisa in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1957 Born
8 Jun 199134.0Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
5 Apr 201860.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
5 Apr 201860.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinisa in Proconsulari
7 Jun 201861.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinisa in Proconsulari

MicroData Summary for Marc Vincent Trudeau
Bishop Marc Vincent Trudeau (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHollywood, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California
Ordained PriestSt. Vibiana, Cathedral, Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Angels, Cathedral, Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2018
  • mn: CB, 5 Apr 2018
  • c2: CB, 5 Apr 2018
  • op: CB, 26 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,788

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Jul 2018

Quantcast