Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Gerald Casey

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Thuburbo Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1967 Born
21 May 199426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
3 Jul 201850.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
3 Jul 201850.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Maius
17 Sep 201850.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Maius

MicroData Summary for Robert Gerald Casey
Bishop Robert Gerald Casey (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained PriestHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Jul 2018
  • c34: CB, 20 Aug 2018
  • mn: CB, 25 Aug 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,852

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast