Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Douglas Conley

Bishop of Lincoln, Nebraska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1955 BornKansas City, MO
6 Dec 197520.7Converted
18 May 198530.2Ordained PriestPriest of Wichita, Kansas, USA
10 Apr 200853.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
10 Apr 200853.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissa
30 May 200853.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissa
8 Sep 201156.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Denver, Colorado, USA
18 Jul 201257.3ResignedApostolic Administrator of Denver, Colorado, USA
14 Sep 201257.5AppointedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
20 Nov 201257.7InstalledBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for James Douglas Conley:
Bishop James Douglas Conley (born ) Bishop of Lincoln

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lincoln.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,752
  • ab: Website of the Diocese, 17 Sep 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2012
  • i/c1: Website of the Diocese, 14 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013