Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Charles Malesic

Bishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1960 Born
24 May 198625.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
30 May 198726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Apr 201554.6AppointedBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA
13 Jul 201554.9Ordained BishopBishop of Greensburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Charles Malesic
Bishop Edward Charles Malesic (born ) Bishop of Greensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHarrisburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Greensburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 24 Apr 2015
  • mn/c2+: CB, 15 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,547

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast