Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ronald William Gainer

Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1947 BornPottsville, PA
19 May 197325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
13 Dec 200255.3AppointedBishop of Lexington, Kentucky, USA
22 Feb 200355.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lexington, Kentucky, USA
24 Jan 201466.4AppointedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Mar 201466.5InstalledBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Ronald William Gainer:
Bishop Ronald William Gainer (born ) Bishop of Harrisburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Harrisburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,335
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2014
  • i: CB, 24 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 16 May 2015