Catholic-Hierarchy DC

William Henry Cardinal Keeler

Archbishop Emeritus of Baltimore, Maryland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1931 BornSan Antonio, TX
17 Jul 195524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Jul 197948.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Jul 197948.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ulcinium
21 Sep 197948.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ulcinium
10 Nov 198352.7AppointedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
4 Jan 198452.8InstalledBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Apr 198958.1AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
23 May 198958.2InstalledArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
26 Nov 199463.7Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199463.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
16 Sep 200372.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Richmond, Virginia, USA
31 Mar 200473.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Richmond, Virginia, USA
12 Jul 200776.4RetiredArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for William Henry Keeler:
Cardinal William Henry Keeler (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Baltimore

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Baltimore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013