Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Francis Malooly

Bishop Emeritus of Wilmington, Delaware, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1944 Born
7 May 197026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
12 Dec 200056.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
12 Dec 200056.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Flumenzer
1 Mar 200157.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flumenzer
7 Jul 200864.4AppointedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
8 Sep 200864.6InstalledBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
30 Apr 202177.2RetiredBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

MicroData Summary for William Francis Malooly
Bishop William Francis Malooly (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Wilmington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained BishopMary Our Queen, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wilmington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,923
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Jul 2021

Quantcast