Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis James Madden

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baltimore, Maryland

Titular Bishop of Baia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1940 BornCarbondale, PA
1 Apr 196727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Nov 197636.6IncardinatedPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
10 May 200565.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
10 May 200565.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Baia
24 Aug 200565.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baia
5 Dec 201676.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for Denis James Madden
Bishop Denis James Madden (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Baltimore

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Baltimore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,963
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016