Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gordon Dunlap Bennett, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Mandeville, Jamaica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1946 BornDenver, CO, USA
14 Jun 197528.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
23 Dec 199751.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
23 Dec 199751.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nesqually
3 Mar 199851.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nesqually
6 Jul 200457.7AppointedBishop of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles
8 Aug 200659.8ResignedBishop of Mandeville, Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Gordon Dunlap Bennett:
Bishop Gordon Dunlap Bennett S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mandeville

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mandeville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013