Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin Carl Rhoades

Bishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1957 BornMahanoy City
22 Apr 198224.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Jul 198325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Oct 200446.9AppointedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Dec 200447.0Ordained BishopBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Nov 200952.0AppointedBishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
13 Jan 201052.1InstalledBishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Kevin Carl Rhoades:
Bishop Kevin Carl Rhoades (born ) Bishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,723
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013