Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Gossman

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1930Born
17 Dec 195525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
15 Jul 196838.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
15 Jul 196838.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aguntum
11 Sep 196838.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aguntum
8 Apr 197545.0AppointedBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
8 Jun 200676.1RetiredBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
12 Aug 201383.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Gossman (VIAF: 46305974)
Bishop Francis Joseph Gossman (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Raleigh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, MD, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2006
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • d: CB, 12 Aug 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast