Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Carmen Dattilo

Deceased

Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1932BornMahoningtown
31 May 195826.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Nov 198957.7AppointedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Jan 199057.9Ordained BishopBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
5 Mar 200472.0DiedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Carmen Dattilo:
Bishop Nicholas Carmen Dattilo (born , died ) Bishop of Harrisburg

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,689
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013