Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Allen Zubik

Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1949 BornSewickley
3 May 197525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Feb 199747.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Feb 199747.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Jamestown
6 Apr 199747.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Jamestown
10 Oct 200354.0AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
12 Dec 200354.2InstalledBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
18 Jul 200757.8AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Sep 200758.0InstalledBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for David Allen Zubik:
Bishop David Allen Zubik (born ) Bishop of Pittsburgh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pittsburgh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,945

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015