Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Joseph Bonnar

Bishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1962 Born
14 Apr 198826.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
23 Jul 198826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
17 Nov 202058.7AppointedBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
12 Jan 202158.9Ordained BishopBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for David Joseph Bonnar
Bishop David Joseph Bonnar (born ) Bishop of Youngstown

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained DeaconSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestSaint Gabriel of the Sorrowful Virgin, Church, Whitehall, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSt. Columba, Cathedral, Youngstown, Diocese of Youngstown, Ohio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Youngstown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 17 Nov 2020
  • mn/c2+: CB, 17 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Jan 2021

Quantcast