Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dennis Marion Schnurr

Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1948 BornSheldon, IA
20 Jul 197426.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
18 Jan 200152.5AppointedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
2 Apr 200152.7Ordained BishopBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
17 Oct 200860.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
7 Dec 200860.4InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
21 Dec 200961.5SucceededArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Dennis Marion Schnurr:
Archbishop Dennis Marion Schnurr (born ) Archbishop of Cincinnati

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cincinnati.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2008
  • s: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,955

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015