Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Lawrence Coffey

Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Arsacal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1960 Born
18 May 199635.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Jan 201958.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
22 Jan 201958.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsacal
25 Mar 201958.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsacal

MicroData Summary for Joseph Lawrence Coffey
Bishop Joseph Lawrence Coffey (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRochester, MN
Ordained BishopNational Shrine of the Immaculate Conception, Basilica, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of United States of America, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2019
  • mn/ob/c12: CB, 22 Jan 2019
  • c3+: CB, 15 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Mar 2019

Quantcast