Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Andrew Schlert

Bishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1961 Born
19 Sep 198726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
27 Jun 201755.9AppointedBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
31 Aug 201756.1Ordained BishopBishop of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Alfred Andrew Schlert
Bishop Alfred Andrew Schlert (born ) Bishop of Allentown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEaston, Diocese of Allentown, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSaint Catherine of Siena, Cathedral, Allentown, Diocese of Allentown, Pennsylvania

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Allentown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2017
  • mn/c1: CB, 27 Jun 2017
  • c2+: CB, 10 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Sep 2017