Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Michael Muhich

Bishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1961 Born
29 Sep 198928.3Ordained PriestPriest of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
12 May 202058.9AppointedBishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA
9 Jul 202059.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rapid City, South Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Michael Muhich
Bishop Peter Michael Muhich (born ) Bishop of Rapid City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEveleth, Diocese of Duluth, Minnesota
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Help, Cathedral, Rapid City, Diocese of Rapid City, South Dakota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rapid City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 10 Jun 2020
  • c2: CB, 17 Jun 2020
  • c34: CB, 9 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 7 Sep 2020

Quantcast