Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Cosgrove

Deceased

Bishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1834Born
27 Aug 185722.6Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
14 Jun 188146.4IncardinatedPriest of Davenport, Iowa, USA
11 Jul 188449.5AppointedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
14 Sep 188449.7Ordained BishopBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
22 Dec 190672.0DiedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary
Henry Cosgrove
Bishop Henry Cosgrove
(born , died )
Bishop of Davenport

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilliamsport, PA, Diocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSt. Marguerite, Cathedral, Davenport, Diocese of Davenport, Iowa

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025