Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Clement Willging

Deceased

Bishop of Pueblo, Colorado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1884BornDubuque
20 Jun 190823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
6 Dec 194157.3AppointedBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
24 Feb 194257.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
3 Mar 195974.5DiedBishop of Pueblo, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Clement Willging:
Bishop Joseph Clement Willging (born , died ) Bishop of Pueblo

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013