Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Thomas Megan, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Xinxiang [Sinsiang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1899Born
1920²20.7ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
29 May 192627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
7 Jul 193637.2AppointedPrefect of Xinxiang [Sinsiang], China
1948²48.7ResignedPrefect of Xinxiang [Sinsiang], China
4 Oct 195152.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Xinxiang [Sinsiang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Megan
Father Thomas Megan S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Xinxiang [Sinsiang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEldora, IA, Archdiocese of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
Death PlaceHattiesburg

  • a priest for 25.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast