Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Tuschen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Antipyrgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1903Born
5 Apr 193026.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
21 Aug 195855.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
21 Aug 195855.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipyrgos
29 Sep 195855.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipyrgos
21 Jun 196158.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Tuschen
Bishop Wilhelm Tuschen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDortmund-Hörde

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast