Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Theodor Jansen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Barica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1923BornNeuss
15 Jul 195128.1Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 May 198359.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 May 198359.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Barica
19 Jun 198360.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barica
15 Jun 199471.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
29 Jan 200480.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Walter Theodor Jansen:
Bishop Walter Theodor Jansen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013