Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ansgar Puff

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Gordus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1956 BornMönchengladbach
26 Jun 198731.5Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
14 Jun 201357.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
14 Jun 201357.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gordus
21 Sep 201357.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gordus

MicroData Summary for Ansgar Puff:
Bishop Ansgar Puff (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 14 Jun 2013
  • c34: CB, 12 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 12 Sep 2013