Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominik Schwaderlapp

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Frequentium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1967 BornSelters/Westerwald
18 Jun 199326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Feb 201244.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
24 Feb 201244.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Frequentium
25 Mar 201244.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Frequentium

MicroData Summary for Dominik Schwaderlapp:
Bishop Dominik Schwaderlapp (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2012
  • c34: CB, 25 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 12 Sep 2013