Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enzo Dieci

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

Titular Bishop of Maura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1934 BornSassuolo
17 Mar 196228.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 199258.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
7 Apr 199258.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Maura
26 Apr 199258.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maura
1 Jun 200975.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enzo Dieci:
Bishop Enzo Dieci (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,675

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013