Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Michel Jalakh, O.A.M.

Secretary of the Dicastery for the Eastern Churches

Priest of Antonin Maronite Order (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1966 Born
15 Aug 198316.9First VowsMember of Antonin Maronite Order (Maronite)
21 Apr 199124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Antonin Maronite Order (Maronite)
15 Feb 202356.4AppointedSecretary of the Dicastery for the Eastern Churches

MicroData Summary for Michel Jalakh
(VIAF: 315111972; WikiData: Q113833234)
Father Michel Jalakh O.A.M. (born ) Secretary of Eastern Churches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaouchrieh, Lebanon

Please contact the Father through the Dicastery for the Eastern Churches.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 22 May 2023