Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Farès Bou Najem

Archbishop of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1967 Born
Dec 1993³26.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon
10 Jul 199426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon
3 Mar 202153.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon
9 Apr 202153.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon
10 Apr 202153.6InstalledArchbishop of Antélias (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Farès Bou Najem
Archbishop Antoine Farès Bou Najem (born ) Archbishop of Antélias

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHarharaya-Kattine
Ordained BishopPatriarchal, Church, Bkerké

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Antélias (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Mar 2021
  • ob/od/c012: CB, 3 Mar 2021
  • c3+: CB, 9 Apr 2021
  • i: CB, 11 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast