Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maroun Ammar

Auxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Canatha

Apostolic Administrator of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1956 Born
17 Sep 198327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Jun 201256.3ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Jun 201256.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
28 Jul 201256.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
30 Jan 201760.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saïdā (Sidone) (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Maroun Ammar
Bishop Maroun Ammar (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHajé

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,518
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017