Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite)

Eparchia Ioubbensis, Sarbensis et Iuniensis Maronitarum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Maroun Ammar, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Paul Rouhana, O.L.M., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Francis Némé Baïssari, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Guy-Paul Noujaim, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Eparchy
  • United: 5 June 1999
  • Metropolitan: Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)
  • Maronite Catholic Church of the Antiochian Tradition
  • Country: Lebanon
  • Mailing Address: Patriarcat Maronite, Bkerke, Liban
  • Telephone: (09)915.441
  • Fax: 938.844

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Eparchy of Joubbé (Maronite)
2 May 1986ErectedEparchy of Joubbé (Maronite) (erected)
Eparchy of Joubbé e Sarba (Maronite)
9 June 1990UnitedEparchy of Joubbé (Maronite)
Diocese of Sarba (Maronite)
Eparchy of Joubbé e Sarba (Maronite)
Eparchy of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite)
5 June 1999UnitedEparchy of Jounieh (Maronite)
Eparchy of Joubbé e Sarba (Maronite)
Eparchy of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite)
1999492,9891681042721,812238283200ap2000
2000419,980131601912,198193231142ap2001
2001357,954131601911,874209141138ap2002
2002353,500139501891,870171162139ap2003
2003354,690139521911,857187163139ap2004
2004375,875144521961,917175172140ap2005
2006359,200141521931,8612180173140ap2007
2009385,258151802311,667917780150ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 1 Aug 2012