Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Rouhana, O.L.M.

Auxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite)

Titular Bishop of Antarados


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1954 BornAmchit
1971²16.1ProfessedMember of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
17 Jan 197823.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
27 Jun 198227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
16 Jun 201257.6ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Jun 201257.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Antarados
28 Jul 201257.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antarados

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Rouhana:
Bishop Paul Rouhana O.L.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Joubbé, Sarba e Jounieh (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 11 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,517

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013