Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charbel Yusef Abdallah

Archbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1967 Born
24 Oct 199225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
1 Nov 202053.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
5 Dec 202053.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Charbel Yusef Abdallah
Archbishop Charbel Yusef Abdallah (born ) Archbishop of Tyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHajjeh
Ordained BishopResurrection, Church, Bkerke

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Tyr (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Nov 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 2 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 28 Nov 2020
  • mn/c34: CB, 5 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 5 Dec 2020

Quantcast