Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Abdel Sater

Archbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1962 Born
29 Jun 198724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
28 Jul 201552.8ConfirmedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
28 Jul 201552.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
5 Sep 201552.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
15 Jun 201956.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
14 Jul 201956.8InstalledArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Paul Abdel Sater
Archbishop Paul Abdel Sater (born ) Archbishop of Beirut {Bairut}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAïn El Remmaneh
Ordained BishopCathedral, Beirut, Archeparchy of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 28 Jul 2015
  • c23: CB, 5 Sep 2015
  • c4: CB, 6 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,569
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2019
  • i: AM, 29 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 8 Oct 2019

Quantcast