Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Moussa El-Hage, O.A.M.

Archbishop of Haifa and the Holy Land {Haifa e Terra Santa} (Maronite)

Apostolic Administrator of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek)

Patriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem and Palestine {Gerusalemme e Palestina} (Maronite)

Patriarchal Exarch of Jordan {Giordania} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1954 BornAntoura
1972²17.9ProfessedMember of Antonin Maronite Order (Maronite)
1979²24.9Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Antonin Maronite Order (Maronite)
14 Aug 198026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Antonin Maronite Order (Maronite)
16 Jun 201258.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Haifa and the Holy Land {Haifa e Terra Santa} (Maronite), Israel
16 Jun 201258.3ConfirmedPatriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem and Palestine {Gerusalemme e Palestina} (Maronite), Palestine
16 Jun 201258.3ConfirmedPatriarchal Exarch of Jordan {Giordania} (Maronite)
28 Jul 201258.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Haifa and the Holy Land {Haifa e Terra Santa} (Maronite), Israel
27 Jan 201459.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Moussa El-Hage:
Archbishop Moussa El-Hage O.A.M. (born ) Archbishop of Haifa and the Holy Land {Haifa e Terra Santa}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Haifa and the Holy Land {Haifa e Terra Santa} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 22 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,515
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014